Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB563 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill March 13, 2019