Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB58 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill April 15, 2019