Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB58 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 58


 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of leased motor
 vehicles that are not held primarily for the production of income by
 the lessee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 11.252, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.252.  MOTOR VEHICLES LEASED FOR [PERSONAL] USE OTHER
 THAN PRODUCTION OF INCOME.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 11.252(b), (d), and (e), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  For purposes of this section, a motor vehicle is
 presumed to be used primarily for activities that do not involve the
 production of income if:
 (1)  50 percent or more of the miles the motor vehicle
 is driven in a year are for non-income producing purposes;
 (2)  the motor vehicle is leased to this state or a
 political subdivision of this state; or
 (3)  the motor vehicle:
 (A)  is leased to an organization that is exempt
 from federal income taxation under Section 501(a), Internal Revenue
 Code of 1986, as an organization described by Section 501(c)(3) of
 that code; and
 (B)  would be exempt from taxation if the vehicle
 were owned by the organization.
 (d)  In connection with the requirements and procedures
 under Subsection (c), the comptroller by rule shall adopt a form to
 be completed by the lessee of a motor vehicle for which the owner of
 the vehicle may apply for an exemption under Subsection (a). The
 form shall require a [the] lessee who is an individual to provide
 the lessee's name, address, and driver's license or personal
 identification certificate number. The form shall require a lessee
 that is an entity described by Subsection (b) to provide the
 lessee's name, address, and, if applicable, federal tax
 identification number. The form shall require a lessee who is an
 individual, or the authorized representative of a lessee that is an
 entity described by Subsection (b), [and] to certify under oath
 that the lessee does not hold the vehicle for the production of
 income and that the vehicle is used primarily for activities that do
 not involve the production of income. The comptroller shall
 include on the form a notice of the penalties prescribed by Section
 37.10, Penal Code, for making a false statement on the form.
 (e)  The owner of a motor vehicle that is subject to a lease
 shall maintain the form, an electronic image of the form, or a
 certified copy of the form completed by the lessee of the vehicle
 and make the form, electronic image, or certified copy available
 for inspection and copying by the chief appraiser of the applicable
 appraisal district at all reasonable times. If the owner does not
 maintain a completed form, electronic image of the completed form,
 or certified copy of the completed form relating to the vehicle, the
 owner:
 (1)  must render the vehicle for taxation in the
 applicable rendition statement or property report filed by the
 owner under Chapter 22; and
 (2)  may not file an application for an exemption under
 Subsection (a) for the vehicle.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 ad valorem taxes imposed for a tax year beginning on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 58 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 58 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor