Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB586 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 586
1+86R29153 JCG-D
2+ By: Watson, et al. S.B. No. 586
3+ (Neave)
4+ Substitute the following for S.B. No. 586: No.
25
36
7+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
48 AN ACT
59 relating to the training of peace officers for family violence and
610 sexual assault assignments.
711 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
812 SECTION 1. Section 1701.253(b), Occupations Code, is
913 amended to read as follows:
1014 (b) In establishing requirements under this section, the
1115 commission shall require courses and programs to provide training
1216 in:
1317 (1) the recognition, investigation, and documentation
1418 of cases that involve[:
1519 [(A)] child abuse and [or] neglect, [;
1620 [(B)] family violence, [;] and
1721 [(C)] sexual assault, including the use of best
1822 practices and trauma-informed response techniques to effectively
1923 recognize, investigate, and document those cases;
2024 (2) issues concerning sex offender characteristics;
2125 and
2226 (3) crime victims' rights under Chapter 56, Code of
2327 Criminal Procedure, and Chapter 57, Family Code, and the duty of law
2428 enforcement agencies to ensure that a victim is afforded those
2529 rights.
2630 SECTION 2. Section 1701.352(b), Occupations Code, is
2731 amended to read as follows:
2832 (b) The commission shall require a state, county, special
2933 district, or municipal agency that appoints or employs peace
3034 officers to provide each peace officer with a training program at
3135 least once every 48 months that is approved by the commission and
3236 consists of:
3337 (1) topics selected by the agency; and
3438 (2) for an officer holding only a basic proficiency
3539 certificate, not more than 20 hours of education and training that
3640 contain curricula incorporating the learning objectives developed
3741 by the commission regarding:
3842 (A) civil rights, racial sensitivity, and
3943 cultural diversity;
4044 (B) de-escalation and crisis intervention
4145 techniques to facilitate interaction with persons with mental
4246 impairments;
4347 (C) de-escalation techniques to facilitate
4448 interaction with members of the public, including techniques for
4549 limiting the use of force resulting in bodily injury; and
4650 (D) unless determined by the agency head to be
4751 inconsistent with the officer's assigned duties:
4852 (i) the recognition, [and] documentation,
4953 and investigation of cases that involve child abuse or neglect,
5054 family violence, and sexual assault, including the use of best
5155 practices and trauma-informed techniques to effectively recognize,
5256 document, and investigate those cases; and
5357 (ii) issues concerning sex offender
5458 characteristics.
5559 SECTION 3. Subchapter I, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
5660 amended by adding Section 1701.4045 to read as follows:
5761 Sec. 1701.4045. CERTIFICATION OF OFFICERS FOR FAMILY
5862 VIOLENCE AND SEXUAL ASSAULT ASSIGNMENTS. (a) The commission by
5963 rule shall establish minimum requirements for the training,
6064 testing, and certification of special officers for responding to
6165 allegations of family violence or sexual assault.
6266 (b) The commission may certify a peace officer as a special
6367 officer for responding to allegations of family violence or sexual
6468 assault if the person:
6569 (1) completes an advanced training course
6670 administered by the commission on recognizing, documenting, and
6771 investigating family violence and sexual assault using best
6872 practices and trauma-informed techniques; and
6973 (2) passes an examination administered by the
7074 commission that is designed to test the person's:
7175 (A) knowledge and recognition of the signs of
7276 family violence and sexual assault; and
7377 (B) skill at documenting and investigating
7478 family violence and sexual assault using best practices and
7579 trauma-informed techniques.
7680 (c) The commission may issue a professional achievement or
7781 proficiency certificate to a peace officer who meets the
7882 requirements of Subsection (b).
7983 SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
8084 Commission on Law Enforcement shall establish the comprehensive
8185 education and training program required by Section 1701.253(b),
8286 Occupations Code, as amended by this Act.
8387 SECTION 5. As soon as practicable after the effective date
8488 of this Act, the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement shall adopt
8589 rules necessary to implement Section 1701.4045, Occupations Code,
8690 as added by this Act.
8791 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
88- ______________________________ ______________________________
89- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
90- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 586 passed the Senate on
91- April 3, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
92- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 13, 2019, by the
93- following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
94- ______________________________
95- Secretary of the Senate
96- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 586 passed the House, with
97- amendment, on May 2, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
98- Nays 0, two present not voting.
99- ______________________________
100- Chief Clerk of the House
101- Approved:
102- ______________________________
103- Date
104- ______________________________
105- Governor