Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB586 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/13/2019

                            S.B. No. 586


 AN ACT
 relating to the training of peace officers for family violence and
 sexual assault assignments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.253(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  In establishing requirements under this section, the
 commission shall require courses and programs to provide training
 in:
 (1)  the recognition, investigation, and documentation
 of cases that involve[:
 [(A)]  child abuse and [or] neglect, [;
 [(B)]  family violence, [;] and
 [(C)]  sexual assault, including the use of best
 practices and trauma-informed response techniques to effectively
 recognize, investigate, and document those cases;
 (2)  issues concerning sex offender characteristics;
 and
 (3)  crime victims' rights under Chapter 56, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, and Chapter 57, Family Code, and the duty of law
 enforcement agencies to ensure that a victim is afforded those
 rights.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1701.352(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The commission shall require a state, county, special
 district, or municipal agency that appoints or employs peace
 officers to provide each peace officer with a training program at
 least once every 48 months that is approved by the commission and
 consists of:
 (1)  topics selected by the agency; and
 (2)  for an officer holding only a basic proficiency
 certificate, not more than 20 hours of education and training that
 contain curricula incorporating the learning objectives developed
 by the commission regarding:
 (A)  civil rights, racial sensitivity, and
 cultural diversity;
 (B)  de-escalation and crisis intervention
 techniques to facilitate interaction with persons with mental
 impairments;
 (C)  de-escalation techniques to facilitate
 interaction with members of the public, including techniques for
 limiting the use of force resulting in bodily injury; and
 (D)  unless determined by the agency head to be
 inconsistent with the officer's assigned duties:
 (i)  the recognition, [and] documentation,
 and investigation of cases that involve child abuse or neglect,
 family violence, and sexual assault, including the use of best
 practices and trauma-informed techniques to effectively recognize,
 document, and investigate those cases; and
 (ii)  issues concerning sex offender
 characteristics.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter I, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.4045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.4045.  CERTIFICATION OF OFFICERS FOR FAMILY
 VIOLENCE AND SEXUAL ASSAULT ASSIGNMENTS. (a)  The commission by
 rule shall establish minimum requirements for the training,
 testing, and certification of special officers for responding to
 allegations of family violence or sexual assault.
 (b)  The commission may certify a peace officer as a special
 officer for responding to allegations of family violence or sexual
 assault if the person:
 (1)  completes an advanced training course
 administered by the commission on recognizing, documenting, and
 investigating family violence and sexual assault using best
 practices and trauma-informed techniques; and
 (2)  passes an examination administered by the
 commission that is designed to test the person's:
 (A)  knowledge and recognition of the signs of
 family violence and sexual assault; and
 (B)  skill at documenting and investigating
 family violence and sexual assault using best practices and
 trauma-informed techniques.
 (c)  The commission may issue a professional achievement or
 proficiency certificate to a peace officer who meets the
 requirements of Subsection (b).
 SECTION 4.  Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall establish the comprehensive
 education and training program required by Section 1701.253(b),
 Occupations Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement shall adopt
 rules necessary to implement Section 1701.4045, Occupations Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 586 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 13, 2019, by the
 following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 586 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 2, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 137,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor