|
06/10/2019
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/10/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote RV#1608
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2019
|
Recommendations filed with the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2019
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|