Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB601 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019