Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB604 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019