|
06/07/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/07/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Record vote RV#770
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Amended 1-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Postponed 4/26/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Postponed 4/25/2019 3:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|