Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB607 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019