|
05/07/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
05/07/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/01/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#759
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Recommendations filed with the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Kolkhorst
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Birdwell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|