Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB626 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019