Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2019
Bill March 20, 2019