Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB649 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 2, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019