Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB649 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 649
1+By: Zaffirini, et al. S.B. No. 649
2+ (Thompson of Brazoria)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to promotion of the use of recyclable materials as
68 feedstock for processing and manufacturing.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 361, Health and Safety
911 Code, is amended by adding Section 361.0152 to read as follows:
1012 Sec. 361.0152. STIMULATE USE OF RECYCLABLE MATERIAL.
1113 (a) In this section:
1214 (1) "Manufacturer" means a facility that uses
1315 postconsumer or postindustrial derived recyclable material to
1416 create a finished product for sale or trade.
1517 (2) "Principal processor" means a facility that
1618 receives recyclable materials from generators or collection
1719 programs and sorts, cleans, screens, bales, densifies, cures, or
1820 creates product that is ready for beneficial reuse immediately
1921 after processing or is ready to be used as a feedstock by a
2022 subsequent processor or manufacturer.
2123 (3) "Recyclable material" includes paper, plastic,
2224 metal, glass, vegetative waste, compost, mulch, tires, electronic
2325 waste, construction and demolition debris, batteries, and paint.
2426 (b) This section does not apply to ferrous or nonferrous
2527 metals recycled by a metal recycling entity as defined by Section
2628 1956.001, Occupations Code.
2729 (c) In cooperation with the Texas Economic Development and
2830 Tourism Office, the commission shall produce a plan to stimulate
2931 the use of recyclable materials as feedstock in processing and
3032 manufacturing.
3133 (d) The plan must:
3234 (1) identify the quantity and type of recyclable
3335 materials that are being recycled from municipal and industrial
3436 sources;
3537 (2) identify and estimate the quantity and type of
3638 recyclable materials that are generated but not being recycled;
3739 (3) identify and estimate the current economic
3840 benefits of recycling materials and the potential economic benefits
3941 to be gained by recycling materials identified under Subdivision
4042 (2);
4143 (4) identify the location, processing capacity, and
4244 consumption capacity of existing principal processors and
4345 manufacturers;
4446 (5) identify the barriers to increasing the use of
4547 recyclable materials as feedstock for principal processors and
4648 manufacturers and means to eliminate those barriers;
4749 (6) identify and estimate the need and type of
4850 principal processing and manufacturing facilities necessary to
4951 consume the existing and potential volumes of recyclable materials;
5052 and
5153 (7) recommend institutional, financial,
5254 administrative, and physical methods, means, and processes that
5355 could be applied by this state and by local governments to:
5456 (A) increase the use of recyclable materials;
5557 (B) stimulate the use of recyclable materials by
5658 principal processors and manufacturers; and
5759 (C) encourage the expansion of existing
5860 principal processors and manufacturers and the development of new
5961 principal processors and manufacturers that use recyclable
6062 materials.
6163 (e) The plan may not require a generator, collector, or
6264 processor of recyclable materials to ship to or use a particular
6365 processing or manufacturing facility.
6466 (f) To the extent practicable in preparing the plan, the
6567 commission shall use methodologies and information derived from
6668 other recycling economic studies already performed.
6769 (g) The commission shall update the plan every four years,
6870 and in a year in which the plan is updated, the plan shall be
6971 included in the annual summary of municipal solid waste management
7072 produced by the municipal solid waste permits section of the
7173 commission and delivered to the governor and legislature.
7274 (h) In cooperation with other state agencies, including the
7375 governor's office, the commission shall develop an education
7476 program intended for the public that must include:
7577 (1) the economic benefits of recycling, including job
7678 creation, economic impact, percent of total municipal and
7779 industrial solid waste recycled, weight and volume of municipal and
7880 industrial solid waste recycled, and taxes and fees paid by the
7981 recycling industry;
8082 (2) a spotlight of collectors and processors of
8183 recyclable materials and manufacturers based in this state that are
8284 using recyclable materials as feedstock; and
8385 (3) the detrimental effects of contamination in the
8486 recyclable materials stream and the need to reduce those effects.
8587 (i) The commission shall update the education program
8688 required by Subsection (h) at least every four years.
8789 (j) The commission may enter into contracts with public,
8890 private, and nonprofit organizations to produce the plan required
8991 by Subsection (c) and the education program required by Subsection
9092 (h).
9193 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas
9294 Commission on Environmental Quality and the Texas Economic
9395 Development and Tourism Office shall prepare and deliver to the
9496 governor and the Municipal Solid Waste Management and Resource
9597 Recovery Advisory Council a progress report on the initial plan and
9698 education program required under Section 361.0152, Health and
9799 Safety Code, as added by this Act.
98100 (b) Not later than September 1, 2021, the Texas Commission
99101 on Environmental Quality and the Texas Economic Development and
100102 Tourism Office shall complete and make publicly available the
101103 initial plan and implement the education program required under
102104 Section 361.0152, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
103105 SECTION 3. The Texas Economic Development and Tourism
104106 Office in the office of the governor and the Texas Commission on
105107 Environmental Quality are required to implement Sections
106108 361.0152(c)-(g), Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, only
107109 if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that
108110 purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money
109111 specifically for that purpose, the Texas Economic Development and
110112 Tourism Office in the office of the governor and the Texas
111113 Commission on Environmental Quality may, but are not required to,
112114 implement those provisions of this Act using other appropriations
113115 available for that purpose.
114116 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
115117 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
116118 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
117119 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
118120 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
119- ______________________________ ______________________________
120- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
121- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 649 passed the Senate on
122- April 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 20, Nays 11.
123- ______________________________
124- Secretary of the Senate
125- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 649 passed the House on
126- May 7, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 120, Nays 24, one
127- present not voting.
128- ______________________________
129- Chief Clerk of the House
130- Approved:
131- ______________________________
132- Date
133- ______________________________
134- Governor