|
06/14/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/14/2019
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#765
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Amended 1-Clardy
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#666
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Laid out in lieu of companion HB 686
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|