Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB68 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2019

                            S.B. No. 68


 AN ACT
 relating to strategic fiscal reviews of state agencies and
 programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 322, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 322.0175 to read as follows:
 Sec. 322.0175.  STRATEGIC FISCAL REVIEW OF STATE AGENCIES
 AND PROGRAMS.  (a)  The board shall perform a strategic fiscal
 review for each state agency currently the subject of Sunset
 Advisory Commission review under Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act).
 The board shall not perform a review under this section of state
 agencies listed in Section 325.025(b), Government Code, because
 these agencies are not subject to the legislative appropriations
 process.
 (b)  The board shall prepare and submit a report of the
 findings of the strategic fiscal review by September 1 of the
 even-numbered year of the biennium during which the review is
 conducted to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives and to the members of the senate finance
 and house appropriations committees.
 (c)  The strategic fiscal review report must contain:
 (1)  a description of the discrete activities the state
 agency is charged with conducting or performing together with:
 (A)  a justification for each activity by
 reference to a statute or other legal authority; and
 (B)  an evaluation of the effectiveness and
 efficiency of the state agency's policies, management, fiscal
 affairs, and operations in relation to each activity;
 (2)  for each activity identified under Subdivision
 (1):
 (A)  a quantitative estimate of any adverse
 effects that reasonably may be expected to result if the activity
 were discontinued, together with a description of the methods by
 which the adverse effects were estimated;
 (B)  an itemized account of expenditures required
 to maintain the activity at the minimum level of service or
 performance required by the statute or other legal authority,
 together with a concise statement of the quantity and quality of
 service or performance required at that minimum level; and
 (C)  an itemized account of expenditures required
 to maintain the activity at the current level of service or
 performance, together with a concise statement of the quantity and
 quality of service or performance provided at that current level;
 (3)  a ranking of activities identified under
 Subdivision (1) that illustrates the relative importance of each
 activity to the overall goals and purposes of the state agency at
 current service or performance levels; and
 (4)  recommendations to the legislature regarding
 whether the legislature should continue funding each activity
 identified under Subdivision (1) and, if so, at what level.
 (d)  The legislature may consider the strategic fiscal
 review reports in connection with the legislative appropriations
 process.
 (e)  Until the board has completed a strategic fiscal review
 under this section, all information, documentary or otherwise,
 prepared or maintained in conducting the strategic fiscal review or
 preparing the strategic fiscal review report, including
 intra-agency and interagency communications and drafts of the
 strategic fiscal review report, or portions of those drafts, is
 excepted from required public disclosure as audit working papers
 under Section 552.116. This subsection does not affect whether
 information described by this subsection is confidential or
 excepted from required public disclosure under a law other than
 Section 552.116.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 68 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 23, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 68 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor