Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB698 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019