Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB708 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 708
1+By: Zaffirini, et al. S.B. No. 708
2+ (Raney, Hinojosa, Clardy, Meza, Meyer, et al.)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to collection and use of child safety data for licensed
68 day-care centers.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
911 is amended by adding Section 42.0412 to read as follows:
1012 Sec. 42.0412. COLLECTION OF LICENSED DAY-CARE CENTER DATA.
1113 (a) In this section, "group of children" and "specified age" are
1214 determined by the formula provided in the commission's minimum
1315 standards for child-care centers.
1416 (b) The commission, in collaboration with the department
1517 and using existing resources, shall collect, compile, and publish
1618 on the commission's Internet website the following data aggregated
1719 by child age on reported incidents in licensed day-care centers
1820 that threaten or impair the basic health, safety, or welfare of a
1921 child:
2022 (1) the number of incidents investigated by the
2123 commission or department and assigned the commission's highest
2224 priority;
2325 (2) the number of incidents investigated by the
2426 commission or department and assigned the commission's
2527 second-highest priority;
2628 (3) the number of violations;
2729 (4) the number of confirmed serious injuries to
2830 children; and
2931 (5) the number of child fatalities.
3032 (c) During each monitoring inspection of a licensed
3133 day-care center the commission conducts, the commission, using
3234 existing resources, shall collect the following data for each group
3335 of children four years of age and younger in the day-care center:
3436 (1) the specified age of the children in the group;
3537 (2) the number of children in the group; and
3638 (3) the number of caregivers supervising the children
3739 in the group.
38- (c-1) The commission, using existing resources, shall
39- collect and publish on the commission's Internet website data on
40- the total number of employees who left employment with each
41- licensed day-care center during the preceding calendar year.
4240 (d) The commission shall make the data collected under this
4341 section available to persons researching the factors related to
4442 child injury, maltreatment, and death in licensed day-care centers
4543 on request.
4644 (e) The commission, using existing resources, shall provide
4745 an annual report to the legislature that includes:
4846 (1) the number of confirmed serious injuries and
49- fatalities for children four years of age and younger, aggregated
50- by the age of the injured or deceased child, including information
51- collected by the department, that occurred:
52- (A) at each licensed day-care center; and
53- (B) at a location other than a licensed day-care
54- center;
47+ fatalities for children four years of age and younger that occurred
48+ at each licensed day-care center, including information collected
49+ by the department, aggregated by the age of the injured or deceased
50+ child;
5551 (2) the priority assigned to the investigation
5652 conducted by the commission or department in response to an
5753 incident that resulted in a serious injury or child fatality;
5854 (3) the number of investigations conducted by the
5955 commission or department at each licensed day-care center involving
6056 a child four years of age or younger that were assigned the highest
6157 priority or second-highest priority, aggregated by the age of the
62- youngest affected child;
58+ youngest affected child; and
6359 (4) the number of violations the commission found at
6460 each licensed day-care center during investigations described by
65- Subdivision (3); and
66- (5) a comparison on whether children under the
67- supervision of a licensed day-care center are more likely than
68- children outside the supervision of a licensed day-care center to
69- suffer a serious injury or death.
70- (f) The commission, in collaboration with the department
71- and using existing resources, shall research, collect, compile, and
72- publish on the commission's Internet website, in a way that allows
73- meaningful comparison on a pro-rata basis of the relative frequency
74- of each event included in the information required under Subsection
75- (b)(4) and (5), the following data aggregated by child age
76- regarding incidents at a location other than a licensed day-care
77- center that threaten or impair the basic health, safety, or welfare
78- of a child:
79- (1) the number of confirmed serious injuries to
80- children; and
81- (2) the number of child fatalities.
82- (g) The commission may collaborate with one or more state
83- agencies to perform a duty under Subsections (e) and (f).
61+ Subdivision (3).
8462 SECTION 2. Section 42.042, Human Resources Code, is amended
8563 by adding Subsection (m-1) to read as follows:
8664 (m-1) Not later than January 1, 2021, the executive
8765 commissioner shall review the data collected under Section 42.0412
8866 and prepare and submit to the legislature a report that includes
89- legislative and regulatory recommendations by age group to enhance
90- child safety. This subsection expires September 1, 2023.
67+ recommendations regarding modifications to the minimum standards
68+ by age group to enhance child safety. This subsection expires
69+ September 1, 2023.
9170 SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Section 42.0412(d), Human
9271 Resources Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services
9372 Commission is not required to comply with that subsection until
9473 January 31, 2020.
9574 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
9675 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
9776 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
9877 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
9978 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
100- ______________________________ ______________________________
101- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
102- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 708 passed the Senate on
103- May 1, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that the
104- Senate concurred in House amendments on May 23, 2019, by the
105- following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
106- ______________________________
107- Secretary of the Senate
108- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 708 passed the House, with
109- amendments, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
110- Nays 9, one present not voting.
111- ______________________________
112- Chief Clerk of the House
113- Approved:
114- ______________________________
115- Date
116- ______________________________
117- Governor