Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB708 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2019

                            S.B. No. 708


 AN ACT
 relating to collection and use of child safety data for licensed
 day-care centers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.0412 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.0412.  COLLECTION OF LICENSED DAY-CARE CENTER DATA.
 (a)  In this section, "group of children" and "specified age" are
 determined by the formula provided in the commission's minimum
 standards for child-care centers.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with the department
 and using existing resources, shall collect, compile, and publish
 on the commission's Internet website the following data aggregated
 by child age on reported incidents in licensed day-care centers
 that threaten or impair the basic health, safety, or welfare of a
 child:
 (1)  the number of incidents investigated by the
 commission or department and assigned the commission's highest
 priority;
 (2)  the number of incidents investigated by the
 commission or department and assigned the commission's
 second-highest priority;
 (3)  the number of violations;
 (4)  the number of confirmed serious injuries to
 children; and
 (5)  the number of child fatalities.
 (c)  During each monitoring inspection of a licensed
 day-care center the commission conducts, the commission, using
 existing resources, shall collect the following data for each group
 of children four years of age and younger in the day-care center:
 (1)  the specified age of the children in the group;
 (2)  the number of children in the group; and
 (3)  the number of caregivers supervising the children
 in the group.
 (c-1)  The commission, using existing resources, shall
 collect and publish on the commission's Internet website data on
 the total number of employees who left employment with each
 licensed day-care center during the preceding calendar year.
 (d)  The commission shall make the data collected under this
 section available to persons researching the factors related to
 child injury, maltreatment, and death in licensed day-care centers
 on request.
 (e)  The commission, using existing resources, shall provide
 an annual report to the legislature that includes:
 (1)  the number of confirmed serious injuries and
 fatalities for children four years of age and younger, aggregated
 by the age of the injured or deceased child, including information
 collected by the department, that occurred:
 (A)  at each licensed day-care center; and
 (B)  at a location other than a licensed day-care
 center;
 (2)  the priority assigned to the investigation
 conducted by the commission or department in response to an
 incident that resulted in a serious injury or child fatality;
 (3)  the number of investigations conducted by the
 commission or department at each licensed day-care center involving
 a child four years of age or younger that were assigned the highest
 priority or second-highest priority, aggregated by the age of the
 youngest affected child;
 (4)  the number of violations the commission found at
 each licensed day-care center during investigations described by
 Subdivision (3); and
 (5)  a comparison on whether children under the
 supervision of a licensed day-care center are more likely than
 children outside the supervision of a licensed day-care center to
 suffer a serious injury or death.
 (f)  The commission, in collaboration with the department
 and using existing resources, shall research, collect, compile, and
 publish on the commission's Internet website, in a way that allows
 meaningful comparison on a pro-rata basis of the relative frequency
 of each event included in the information required under Subsection
 (b)(4) and (5), the following data aggregated by child age
 regarding incidents at a location other than a licensed day-care
 center that threaten or impair the basic health, safety, or welfare
 of a child:
 (1)  the number of confirmed serious injuries to
 children; and
 (2)  the number of child fatalities.
 (g)  The commission may collaborate with one or more state
 agencies to perform a duty under Subsections (e) and (f).
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.042, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (m-1) to read as follows:
 (m-1)  Not later than January 1, 2021, the executive
 commissioner shall review the data collected under Section 42.0412
 and prepare and submit to the legislature a report that includes
 legislative and regulatory recommendations by age group to enhance
 child safety. This subsection expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Section 42.0412(d), Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services
 Commission is not required to comply with that subsection until
 January 31, 2020.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 708 passed the Senate on
 May 1, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendments on May 23, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 708 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
 Nays 9, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor