Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB72 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2019
Bill March 7, 2019