Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB73 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2019
Bill March 7, 2019