Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB733 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019