Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB743 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2019
Bill March 12, 2019