Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB747 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019