Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB747 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2019

                            S.B. No. 747


 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of the newborn screening program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.004(f), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  The executive commissioner by rule shall [may]
 establish the amounts charged for newborn screening fees, including
 fees assessed for follow-up services, tracking confirmatory
 testing, and diagnosis. In adopting rules under this subsection,
 the executive commissioner shall ensure that amounts charged for
 newborn screening fees are sufficient to cover the costs of
 performing the screening.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 33, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 33.019 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.019.  NOTICE OF COST AND CLAIM PROCESS. (a)  The
 department shall publish on its Internet website the cost of and
 instructions on the full claim and reimbursement process for a
 newborn screening test kit to be used to comply with the test
 requirements of Section 33.011.
 (b)  The department may change the cost published under
 Subsection (a) not later than the 90th day before the date the
 department publishes notice of the change on its Internet website.
 If the department changes the cost under this subsection, the
 department shall retain a record of the previous cost until the
 first anniversary of the date of the change.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 33, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. NEWBORN SCREENING PRESERVATION ACCOUNT
 Sec. 33.051.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "account"
 means the newborn screening preservation account established under
 Section 33.052.
 Sec. 33.052.  CREATION OF ACCOUNT. (a)  The newborn
 screening preservation account is a dedicated account in the
 general revenue fund. Money in the account may be appropriated only
 to the department and only for the purpose of carrying out the
 newborn screening program established under this chapter.
 (b)  On November 1 of each year, the comptroller shall
 transfer to the account any unexpended and unencumbered money from
 Medicaid reimbursements collected by the department for newborn
 screening services during the preceding state fiscal year.
 (c)  The account is composed of:
 (1)  money transferred to the account under Subsection
 (b);
 (2)  gifts, grants, donations, and legislative
 appropriations; and
 (3)  interest earned on the investment of money in the
 account.
 (d)  Section 403.0956, Government Code, does not apply to the
 account.
 (e)  The department administers the account. The department
 may solicit and receive gifts, grants, and donations from any
 source for the benefit of the account.
 Sec. 33.053.  DEDICATED USE. (a)  The department may use
 any money remaining in the account after paying the costs of
 operating the newborn screening program established under this
 chapter only to:
 (1)  pay the costs of offering additional newborn
 screening tests not offered under this chapter before September 1,
 2019, including the operational costs incurred during the first
 year of implementing the additional tests; and
 (2)  pay for capital assets, equipment, and renovations
 for the laboratory established by the department to ensure the
 continuous operation of the newborn screening program.
 (b)  The department may not use money from the account for
 the department's general operating expenses.
 Sec. 33.054.  REPORT. If the department requires an
 additional newborn screening test under Subchapter B the costs of
 which are funded with money appropriated from the newborn screening
 preservation account, the department shall, not later than
 September 1 of each even-numbered year, prepare and submit to the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and each standing committee of the legislature
 having primary jurisdiction over the department a written report
 that:
 (1)  summarizes the implementation plan for the test,
 including anticipated completion dates for implementing the test
 and potential barriers to conducting the test; and
 (2)  summarizes the actions taken by the department to
 fund and implement the test during the preceding two years.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1271.154, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1271.154.  WELL-CHILD CARE FROM BIRTH.  (a)  In this
 section, "well-child care from birth" has the meaning used under
 Section 1302, Public Health Service Act (42 U.S.C. Section 300e-1),
 and its subsequent amendments.  The term includes administration of
 newborn screening required by the [Texas] Department of State
 Health Services and the cost of the newborn screening test kit
 described by Section 33.019, Health and Safety Code.
 (b)  A health maintenance organization shall ensure that
 each health care plan provided by the health maintenance
 organization includes well-child care from birth that complies
 with:
 (1)  federal requirements adopted under Chapter XI,
 Public Health Service Act (42 U.S.C. Section 300e et seq.), and its
 subsequent amendments; and
 (2)  the rules adopted by the executive commissioner
 [Texas Department] of the Health and Human Services Commission to
 implement those requirements, including rules on the cost of the
 newborn screening test kit described by Section 33.019, Health and
 Safety Code.
 SECTION 5.  Section 1367.003, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1367.003.  CERTAIN LIMITATIONS ON COVERAGE FOR NEWBORN
 CHILDREN PROHIBITED. A health benefit plan that provides maternity
 benefits or accident and health coverage for additional newborn
 children may not be issued in this state if the plan excludes or
 limits:
 (1)  initial coverage of a newborn child for a period of
 time; [or]
 (2)  coverage for congenital defects of a newborn
 child; or
 (3)  coverage for administration of the newborn
 screening tests required by Section 33.011, Health and Safety Code,
 including for the cost of a newborn screening test kit in the amount
 provided by the Department of State Health Services on its Internet
 website under Section 33.019 of that code on the date the test was
 administered.
 SECTION 6.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement this
 Act.
 SECTION 7.  Notwithstanding Section 33.054, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, the Department of State Health
 Services shall submit the first report required by that section not
 later than December 1, 2019.
 SECTION 8.  Section 33.019, Health and Safety Code, as added
 by this Act, and Sections 1271.154 and 1367.003, Insurance Code, as
 amended by this Act, apply only to a health benefit plan delivered,
 issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2020.  A
 health benefit plan delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed
 before January 1, 2020, is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 747 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 23, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 747 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor