Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB749 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019