House | 04/30/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 02/01/2019 | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 11/12/2018 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2018 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |