Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB812 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 812
1+By: Lucio, et al. S.B. No. 812
2+ (Thompson of Harris, Coleman, Allen, Johnson of Harris,
3+ Morales, et al.)
24
35
6+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
47 AN ACT
58 relating to the application of the limit on appraised value of a
69 residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes to an improvement
710 that is a replacement structure for a structure that was rendered
811 uninhabitable or unusable by a casualty or by wind or water damage.
912 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1013 SECTION 1. Section 23.23(g), Tax Code, is amended to read as
1114 follows:
1215 (g) In this subsection, "disaster recovery program" means
1316 the disaster recovery program administered by the General Land
1417 Office or by a political subdivision of this state that is funded
1518 with community development block grant disaster recovery money
1619 authorized by federal law [the Consolidated Security, Disaster
1720 Assistance, and Continuing Appropriations Act, 2009 (Pub. L.
1821 No. 110-329) and the Consolidated and Further Continuing
1922 Appropriations Act, 2012 (Pub. L. No. 112-55)]. Notwithstanding
2023 Subsection (f)(2), and only to the extent necessary to satisfy the
2124 requirements of the disaster recovery program, a replacement
2225 structure described by that subdivision is not considered to be a
2326 new improvement if to satisfy the requirements of the disaster
2427 recovery program it was necessary that:
2528 (1) the square footage of the replacement structure
2629 exceed that of the replaced structure as that structure existed
2730 before the casualty or damage occurred; or
2831 (2) the exterior of the replacement structure be of
2932 higher quality construction and composition than that of the
3033 replaced structure.
3134 SECTION 2. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
3235 date of this Act, but not later than the 14th day after that date,
3336 the General Land Office and each political subdivision that
3437 administers a disaster recovery program described by Section
3538 23.23(g), Tax Code, as amended by this Act, shall:
3639 (1) prepare a list of each replacement structure
3740 described by Section 23.23(g), Tax Code, that has been constructed
3841 since January 1, 2018, under a disaster recovery program
3942 administered by the entity; and
4043 (2) provide a list to the chief appraiser of each
4144 appraisal district of the property on the list described by
4245 Subdivision (1) of this subsection that is located in that
4346 appraisal district.
4447 (b) As soon as practicable, but not later than the 60th day
4548 after the date the chief appraiser of an appraisal district
4649 receives a list under Subsection (a)(2) of this section:
4750 (1) the chief appraiser shall, if necessary, take the
4851 following actions regarding each affected property on the list:
4952 (A) correct or supplement, as appropriate, the
5053 appraisal records for the appraisal district to indicate the
5154 correct appraised value for the affected property for the current
5255 tax year;
5356 (B) deliver a corrected notice of appraised value
5457 to the owner of the affected property if a notice of appraised value
5558 for that property was previously sent to the property owner for the
5659 current tax year; and
5760 (C) notify the assessor and collector for each
5861 taxing unit in which the affected property is located of the
5962 correction or supplementation of the appraisal records for the
6063 appraisal district if the appraisal records have been approved for
6164 the current tax year;
6265 (2) the assessor for each taxing unit all or part of
6366 the territory of which is located in the appraisal district shall
6467 deliver a corrected tax bill to each owner of property for which the
6568 chief appraiser corrected the appraised value under Subdivision
6669 (1)(A) of this subsection if the taxing unit previously delivered a
6770 bill for the taxes on the property for the current tax year and the
6871 taxes on the property have not been paid; and
6972 (3) the collector for each taxing unit all or part of
7073 the territory of which is located in the appraisal district shall
7174 refund to each owner of property for which the chief appraiser
7275 corrected the appraised value under Subdivision (1)(A) of this
7376 subsection the amount by which the taxes paid exceeded the amount of
7477 taxes due if the taxing unit previously delivered a bill for the
7578 taxes on the property for the current tax year and the taxes on the
7679 property have been paid.
7780 SECTION 3. This Act applies only to the appraisal of a
7881 residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes for a tax year that
7982 begins on or after January 1, 2019.
8083 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
8184 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
8285 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
8386 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8487 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
85- ______________________________ ______________________________
86- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
87- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 812 passed the Senate on
88- April 4, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
89- ______________________________
90- Secretary of the Senate
91- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 812 passed the House on
92- April 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 0, two
93- present not voting.
94- ______________________________
95- Chief Clerk of the House
96- Approved:
97- ______________________________
98- Date
99- ______________________________
100- Governor