Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB812 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/29/2019

                            S.B. No. 812


 AN ACT
 relating to the application of the limit on appraised value of a
 residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes to an improvement
 that is a replacement structure for a structure that was rendered
 uninhabitable or unusable by a casualty or by wind or water damage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.23(g), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (g)  In this subsection, "disaster recovery program" means
 the disaster recovery program administered by the General Land
 Office or by a political subdivision of this state that is funded
 with community development block grant disaster recovery money
 authorized by federal law [the Consolidated Security, Disaster
 Assistance, and Continuing Appropriations Act, 2009 (Pub. L.
 No.   110-329) and the Consolidated and Further Continuing
 Appropriations Act, 2012 (Pub. L. No.   112-55)]. Notwithstanding
 Subsection (f)(2), and only to the extent necessary to satisfy the
 requirements of the disaster recovery program, a replacement
 structure described by that subdivision is not considered to be a
 new improvement if to satisfy the requirements of the disaster
 recovery program it was necessary that:
 (1)  the square footage of the replacement structure
 exceed that of the replaced structure as that structure existed
 before the casualty or damage occurred; or
 (2)  the exterior of the replacement structure be of
 higher quality construction and composition than that of the
 replaced structure.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act, but not later than the 14th day after that date,
 the General Land Office and each political subdivision that
 administers a disaster recovery program described by Section
 23.23(g), Tax Code, as amended by this Act, shall:
 (1)  prepare a list of each replacement structure
 described by Section 23.23(g), Tax Code, that has been constructed
 since January 1, 2018, under a disaster recovery program
 administered by the entity; and
 (2)  provide a list to the chief appraiser of each
 appraisal district of the property on the list described by
 Subdivision (1) of this subsection that is located in that
 appraisal district.
 (b)  As soon as practicable, but not later than the 60th day
 after the date the chief appraiser of an appraisal district
 receives a list under Subsection (a)(2) of this section:
 (1)  the chief appraiser shall, if necessary, take the
 following actions regarding each affected property on the list:
 (A)  correct or supplement, as appropriate, the
 appraisal records for the appraisal district to indicate the
 correct appraised value for the affected property for the current
 tax year;
 (B)  deliver a corrected notice of appraised value
 to the owner of the affected property if a notice of appraised value
 for that property was previously sent to the property owner for the
 current tax year; and
 (C)  notify the assessor and collector for each
 taxing unit in which the affected property is located of the
 correction or supplementation of the appraisal records for the
 appraisal district if the appraisal records have been approved for
 the current tax year;
 (2)  the assessor for each taxing unit all or part of
 the territory of which is located in the appraisal district shall
 deliver a corrected tax bill to each owner of property for which the
 chief appraiser corrected the appraised value under Subdivision
 (1)(A) of this subsection if the taxing unit previously delivered a
 bill for the taxes on the property for the current tax year and the
 taxes on the property have not been paid; and
 (3)  the collector for each taxing unit all or part of
 the territory of which is located in the appraisal district shall
 refund to each owner of property for which the chief appraiser
 corrected the appraised value under Subdivision (1)(A) of this
 subsection the amount by which the taxes paid exceeded the amount of
 taxes due if the taxing unit previously delivered a bill for the
 taxes on the property for the current tax year and the taxes on the
 property have been paid.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies only to the appraisal of a
 residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes for a tax year that
 begins on or after January 1, 2019.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 812 passed the Senate on
 April 4, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 812 passed the House on
 April 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 137, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor