|
06/15/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/28/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#1976
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote RV#1595
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 2-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote RV#1561
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Failed to pass
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 1-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|