Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB815 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019