House
|
04/25/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|