Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB893 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019