4 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 9 | | relating to the supervision of water districts by the Texas |
---|
6 | 10 | | Commission on Environmental Quality. |
---|
7 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Section 12.081(a), Water Code, is amended to |
---|
9 | 13 | | read as follows: |
---|
10 | 14 | | (a) The powers and duties of all districts and authorities |
---|
11 | 15 | | created under Article III, Section 52 and Article XVI, Section 59 of |
---|
12 | 16 | | the Texas Constitution are subject to the continuing right of |
---|
13 | 17 | | supervision of the State of Texas by and through the commission or |
---|
14 | 18 | | its successor, and this supervision may include but is not limited |
---|
15 | 19 | | to the authority to: |
---|
16 | 20 | | (1) inquire into the qualifications [competence, |
---|
17 | 21 | | fitness, and reputation] of the officers and directors of any |
---|
18 | 22 | | district or authority; |
---|
19 | 23 | | (2) require, on its own motion or on complaint by any |
---|
20 | 24 | | person, audits or other financial information, inspections, |
---|
21 | 25 | | evaluations, and engineering reports; |
---|
22 | 26 | | (3) issue subpoenas for witnesses to carry out its |
---|
23 | 27 | | authority under this subsection; |
---|
24 | 28 | | (4) institute investigations and hearings using |
---|
25 | 29 | | examiners appointed by the commission; |
---|
26 | 30 | | (5) issue rules necessary to supervise the districts |
---|
27 | 31 | | and authorities, except that such rules shall not apply to water |
---|
28 | 32 | | quality ordinances adopted by any river authority which meet or |
---|
33 | 35 | | apply to matters relating to electric utility operations. |
---|
34 | 36 | | SECTION 2. Sections 49.102(e) and (f), Water Code, are |
---|
35 | 37 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
36 | 38 | | (e) If a majority of the votes cast in the election favor the |
---|
37 | 39 | | creation of the district, then the temporary board shall declare |
---|
38 | 40 | | that the district is created and enter the result in its minutes. |
---|
39 | 41 | | If a majority of the votes cast in the election are against the |
---|
40 | 42 | | creation of the district, the temporary board shall declare that |
---|
41 | 43 | | the district was defeated and enter the result in its minutes. A |
---|
42 | 44 | | copy of the order shall be filed with the commission not later than |
---|
43 | 45 | | the 30th day after the date of the election. |
---|
44 | 46 | | (f) The order canvassing the results of the confirmation |
---|
45 | 47 | | election shall contain a description of the district's boundaries |
---|
46 | 48 | | and shall be filed with the executive director and in the deed |
---|
47 | 49 | | records of the county or counties in which the district is located |
---|
48 | 50 | | not later than the 30th day after the date of the election. |
---|
49 | 51 | | SECTION 3. Section 49.195(a), Water Code, is amended to |
---|
50 | 52 | | read as follows: |
---|
51 | 53 | | (a) The executive director may review the audit report of |
---|
52 | 54 | | each district. After reviewing the audit report, the executive |
---|
53 | 55 | | director may request additional information from the district. The |
---|
54 | 56 | | district shall provide the additional information not later than |
---|
55 | 57 | | the 60th day after the date the request was received, unless the |
---|
56 | 58 | | executive director extends the time allowed for the district to |
---|
57 | 59 | | provide additional information for good cause. |
---|
58 | 60 | | SECTION 4. Section 49.196(a), Water Code, is amended to |
---|
59 | 61 | | read as follows: |
---|
60 | 62 | | (a) The executive director may review and investigate a |
---|
61 | 63 | | district's financial records and may conduct an on-site audit of a |
---|
62 | 64 | | district's financial information. The executive director shall |
---|
63 | 65 | | have access to all vouchers, receipts, district fiscal and |
---|
64 | 66 | | financial records, and other district records the executive |
---|
65 | 67 | | director considers necessary. |
---|
66 | | - | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
67 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
69 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 911 passed the Senate on |
---|
70 | | - | May 7, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
71 | | - | May 23, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
72 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2019, House |
---|
73 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2019, Senate adopted |
---|
74 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
75 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
76 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
77 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
78 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 911 passed the House, with |
---|
79 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137, |
---|
80 | | - | Nays 7, two present not voting; May 23, 2019, House granted request |
---|
81 | | - | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
82 | | - | May 26, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
83 | | - | following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
84 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
85 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
86 | | - | Approved: |
---|
87 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
88 | | - | Date |
---|
89 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 68 | + | SECTION 5. Title 2, Water Code, is amended by adding |
---|
| 69 | + | Subtitle G to read as follows: |
---|
| 70 | + | SUBTITLE G. MISCELLANEOUS PROVISIONS |
---|
| 71 | + | CHAPTER 39. STANDARDS FOR SUPERVISION OF WATER DISTRICTS IN |
---|
| 72 | + | CERTAIN AREAS |
---|
| 73 | + | Sec. 39.0101. STANDARDS FOR SURFACE WATER AND GROUNDWATER |
---|
| 74 | + | MANAGEMENT IN CERTAIN AREAS. (a) This section applies to a county: |
---|
| 75 | + | (1) bordering the Rio Grande; |
---|
| 76 | + | (2) overlying the Edwards-Trinity Aquifer; and |
---|
| 77 | + | (3) with a population greater than 40,000. |
---|
| 78 | + | (b) To provide the best available science in the event a |
---|
| 79 | + | conservation and reclamation district is created under the |
---|
| 80 | + | authority of Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, in the |
---|
| 81 | + | area described by Subsection (a), the Texas Water Development |
---|
| 82 | + | Board, in coordination with the Texas Commission on Environmental |
---|
| 83 | + | Quality, shall adopt standards for water management by a |
---|
| 84 | + | conservation and reclamation district in the area described by |
---|
| 85 | + | Subsection (a). |
---|
| 86 | + | (c) Standards adopted under this section must address: |
---|
| 87 | + | (1) groundwater management; and |
---|
| 88 | + | (2) river and spring flow, including flow requirements |
---|
| 89 | + | for: |
---|
| 90 | + | (A) the Devil's River; |
---|
| 91 | + | (B) the Pecos River; and |
---|
| 92 | + | (C) San Felipe Springs. |
---|
| 93 | + | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|