Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB911 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            S.B. No. 911


 AN ACT
 relating to the supervision of water districts by the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.081(a), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The powers and duties of all districts and authorities
 created under Article III, Section 52 and Article XVI, Section 59 of
 the Texas Constitution are subject to the continuing right of
 supervision of the State of Texas by and through the commission or
 its successor, and this supervision may include but is not limited
 to the authority to:
 (1)  inquire into the qualifications [competence,
 fitness, and reputation] of the officers and directors of any
 district or authority;
 (2)  require, on its own motion or on complaint by any
 person, audits or other financial information, inspections,
 evaluations, and engineering reports;
 (3)  issue subpoenas for witnesses to carry out its
 authority under this subsection;
 (4)  institute investigations and hearings using
 examiners appointed by the commission;
 (5)  issue rules necessary to supervise the districts
 and authorities, except that such rules shall not apply to water
 quality ordinances adopted by any river authority which meet or
 exceed minimum requirements established by the commission; [and]
 (6)  issue a permit under Chapter 361, Health and
 Safety Code, notwithstanding a district's rule or objection; and
 (7)  the right of supervision granted herein shall not
 apply to matters relating to electric utility operations.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 49.102(e) and (f), Water Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  If a majority of the votes cast in the election favor the
 creation of the district, then the temporary board shall declare
 that the district is created and enter the result in its minutes.
 If a majority of the votes cast in the election are against the
 creation of the district, the temporary board shall declare that
 the district was defeated and enter the result in its minutes. A
 copy of the order shall be filed with the commission not later than
 the 30th day after the date of the election.
 (f)  The order canvassing the results of the confirmation
 election shall contain a description of the district's boundaries
 and shall be filed with the executive director and in the deed
 records of the county or counties in which the district is located
 not later than the 30th day after the date of the election.
 SECTION 3.  Section 49.195(a), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The executive director may review the audit report of
 each district. After reviewing the audit report, the executive
 director may request additional information from the district. The
 district shall provide the additional information not later than
 the 60th day after the date the request was received, unless the
 executive director extends the time allowed for the district to
 provide additional information for good cause.
 SECTION 4.  Section 49.196(a), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The executive director may review and investigate a
 district's financial records and may conduct an on-site audit of a
 district's financial information. The executive director shall
 have access to all vouchers, receipts, district fiscal and
 financial records, and other district records the executive
 director considers necessary.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 911 passed the Senate on
 May 7, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2019, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2019, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 911 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 137,
 Nays 7, two present not voting; May 23, 2019, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 26, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor