Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB916 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2019
Bill April 23, 2019