4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to supportive palliative care. |
---|
6 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle G, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
8 | 10 | | amended by adding Chapter 142A to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 11 | | CHAPTER 142A. SUPPORTIVE PALLIATIVE CARE SERVICES |
---|
10 | 12 | | Sec. 142A.0001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "supportive |
---|
11 | 13 | | palliative care" means physician-directed interdisciplinary |
---|
12 | 14 | | patient- and family-centered care provided to a patient with a |
---|
13 | 15 | | serious illness without regard to the patient's age or terminal |
---|
14 | 16 | | prognosis that: |
---|
15 | 17 | | (1) may be provided concurrently with methods of |
---|
16 | 18 | | treatment or therapies that seek to cure or minimize the effects of |
---|
17 | 19 | | the patient's illness; and |
---|
18 | 20 | | (2) seeks to optimize the quality of life for a patient |
---|
19 | 21 | | with a life-threatening or life-limiting illness and the patient's |
---|
20 | 22 | | family through various methods, including methods that seek to: |
---|
21 | 23 | | (A) anticipate, prevent, and treat the patient's |
---|
22 | 24 | | total suffering related to the patient's physical, emotional, |
---|
23 | 25 | | social, and spiritual condition; |
---|
24 | 26 | | (B) address the physical, intellectual, |
---|
25 | 27 | | emotional, cultural, social, and spiritual needs of the patient; |
---|
26 | 28 | | and |
---|
27 | 29 | | (C) facilitate for the patient regarding |
---|
28 | 30 | | treatment options, education, informed consent, and expression of |
---|
29 | 31 | | desires. |
---|
30 | 32 | | Sec. 142A.0002. REFERENCE IN OTHER LAW. Notwithstanding |
---|
31 | 33 | | any other law, a reference in this code or other law to palliative |
---|
32 | 34 | | care means supportive palliative care. |
---|
33 | 35 | | Sec. 142A.0003. STUDY. (a) The commission shall conduct a |
---|
34 | 36 | | study to assess potential improvements to a patient's quality of |
---|
35 | 37 | | care and health outcomes and to anticipated cost savings to this |
---|
36 | 38 | | state from supporting the use of or providing Medicaid |
---|
37 | 39 | | reimbursement to certain Medicaid recipients for supportive |
---|
38 | 40 | | palliative care. The study must include an evaluation and |
---|
39 | 41 | | comparison of other states that provide Medicaid reimbursement for |
---|
40 | 42 | | supportive palliative care. |
---|
41 | 43 | | (b) The Palliative Care Interdisciplinary Advisory Council |
---|
42 | 44 | | established under Chapter 118 shall provide to the commission |
---|
43 | 45 | | recommendations on the structure of the study, including |
---|
44 | 46 | | recommendations on identifying specific populations of Medicaid |
---|
45 | 47 | | recipients, variables, and outcomes to measure in the study. |
---|
46 | 48 | | (c) The commission may collaborate with and solicit and |
---|
47 | 49 | | accept gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private |
---|
48 | 50 | | source for the purpose of funding the study. |
---|
49 | 51 | | (d) Not later than September 1, 2022, the commission shall |
---|
50 | 52 | | provide to the Palliative Care Interdisciplinary Advisory Council |
---|
51 | 53 | | the findings of the study. Not later than October 1, 2022, the |
---|
52 | 54 | | advisory council shall include the findings of the study in the |
---|
53 | 55 | | report required under Section 118.010. |
---|
54 | 56 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
55 | 57 | | SECTION 2. Section 142.001(15), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
56 | 58 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
57 | 59 | | (15) "Hospice services" means services, including |
---|
58 | 60 | | services provided by unlicensed personnel under the delegation of a |
---|
59 | 61 | | registered nurse or physical therapist, provided to a client or a |
---|
60 | 62 | | client's family as part of a coordinated program consistent with |
---|
61 | 63 | | the standards and rules adopted under this chapter. These services |
---|
62 | 64 | | include [palliative care for terminally ill clients and] support |
---|
63 | 65 | | services for terminally ill patients [clients] and their families |
---|
64 | 66 | | that: |
---|
65 | 67 | | (A) are available 24 hours a day, seven days a |
---|
66 | 68 | | week, during the last stages of illness, during death, and during |
---|
67 | 69 | | bereavement; |
---|
68 | 70 | | (B) are provided by a medically directed |
---|
69 | 71 | | interdisciplinary team; and |
---|
70 | 72 | | (C) may be provided in a home, nursing home, |
---|
71 | 73 | | residential unit, or inpatient unit according to need. These |
---|
72 | 74 | | services do not include inpatient care normally provided in a |
---|
73 | 75 | | licensed hospital to a terminally ill person who has not elected to |
---|
74 | 76 | | be a hospice client. |
---|
75 | 77 | | SECTION 3. Section 142.001(20), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
76 | 78 | | repealed. |
---|
77 | 79 | | SECTION 4. The Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
78 | 80 | | conduct the study required under Section 142A.0003, Health and |
---|
79 | 81 | | Safety Code, as added by this Act, only if the commission receives a |
---|
80 | 82 | | gift, grant, or donation or the legislature appropriates money |
---|
81 | 83 | | specifically for that purpose. If the commission does not receive a |
---|
82 | 84 | | gift, grant, or donation and the legislature does not appropriate |
---|
83 | 85 | | money specifically for that purpose, the commission may, but is not |
---|
84 | 86 | | required to, conduct the study using other money available for that |
---|
85 | 87 | | purpose. |
---|
86 | 88 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
87 | 89 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
88 | 90 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
89 | 91 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
90 | 92 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
91 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
92 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
93 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 916 passed the Senate on |
---|
94 | | - | April 30, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; |
---|
95 | | - | May 23, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and |
---|
96 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2019, House |
---|
97 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2019, Senate adopted |
---|
98 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
99 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
100 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
101 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
102 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 916 passed the House, with |
---|
103 | | - | amendment, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137, |
---|
104 | | - | Nays 9, one present not voting; May 23, 2019, House granted request |
---|
105 | | - | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
106 | | - | May 26, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
107 | | - | following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 16, two present not voting. |
---|
108 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
109 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
110 | | - | Approved: |
---|
111 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
112 | | - | Date |
---|
113 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
114 | | - | Governor |
---|