Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB935 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019