4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to reimbursement of federal military treatment facilities |
---|
6 | 8 | | under the workers' compensation system. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 413, Labor Code, is |
---|
9 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 413.0112 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 12 | | Sec. 413.0112. REIMBURSEMENT OF FEDERAL MILITARY TREATMENT |
---|
11 | 13 | | FACILITY. (a) In this section, "federal military treatment |
---|
12 | 14 | | facility" means a medical facility that operates as part of the |
---|
13 | 15 | | Military Health System of the United States Department of Defense. |
---|
14 | 16 | | (b) The reimbursement rates for medical services provided |
---|
15 | 17 | | to an injured employee by a federal military treatment facility |
---|
16 | 18 | | must be the amount charged by the facility as determined under 32 |
---|
17 | 19 | | C.F.R. Part 220. |
---|
18 | 20 | | (c) Chapter 1305, Insurance Code, and the following |
---|
19 | 21 | | sections of this code do not apply to the reimbursement of a federal |
---|
20 | 22 | | military treatment facility's charges for medical services |
---|
21 | 23 | | provided to an injured employee: |
---|
22 | 24 | | (1) Sections 408.027(a) and (f); |
---|
23 | 25 | | (2) Section 408.0271; |
---|
24 | 26 | | (3) Section 408.0272; |
---|
25 | 27 | | (4) Section 408.028; |
---|
26 | 28 | | (5) Section 408.0281; |
---|
27 | 29 | | (6) Section 413.011; |
---|
28 | 30 | | (7) Section 413.014; |
---|
29 | 31 | | (8) Section 413.031, as that section relates to |
---|
30 | 32 | | medical fee disputes; |
---|
31 | 33 | | (9) Section 413.041; and |
---|
32 | 34 | | (10) Section 504.053. |
---|
33 | 35 | | (d) The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to |
---|
34 | 36 | | implement this section, including rules establishing: |
---|
35 | 37 | | (1) requirements for processing medical bills for |
---|
36 | 38 | | services provided to an injured employee by a federal military |
---|
37 | 39 | | treatment facility; and |
---|
38 | 40 | | (2) a separate medical dispute resolution process to |
---|
39 | 41 | | resolve disputes over charges billed directly to an injured |
---|
40 | 42 | | employee by a federal military treatment facility. |
---|
41 | 43 | | SECTION 2. The commissioner of workers' compensation shall |
---|
42 | 44 | | adopt rules as required by Section 413.0112, Labor Code, as added by |
---|
43 | 45 | | this Act, not later than December 1, 2019. |
---|
44 | 46 | | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
45 | 47 | | to health care services provided on or after January 1, 2020, in |
---|
46 | 48 | | conjunction with a claim for workers' compensation benefits, |
---|
47 | 49 | | regardless of the date on which the compensable injury that is the |
---|
48 | 50 | | basis of the claim occurred. |
---|
49 | 51 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
50 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
51 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
52 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 935 passed the Senate on |
---|
53 | | - | March 27, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
54 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
56 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 935 passed the House on |
---|
57 | | - | May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, two |
---|
58 | | - | present not voting. |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
61 | | - | Approved: |
---|
62 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Date |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Governor |
---|