Senate | 03/26/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |