7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 11 | | amended by adding Sections 418.054 and 418.055 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 12 | | Sec. 418.054. EMERGENCY PLAN FOR SPECIALTY CARE |
---|
11 | 13 | | POPULATIONS. The division, in consultation with the Department of |
---|
12 | 14 | | State Health Services and local governmental entities that have |
---|
13 | 15 | | established emergency management plans, shall develop a plan to |
---|
14 | 16 | | increase the capabilities of local emergency shelters in the |
---|
15 | 17 | | provision of shelter and care for specialty care populations during |
---|
16 | 18 | | a disaster. |
---|
17 | 19 | | Sec. 418.055. ACCESS TO LOCAL VOLUNTEER NETWORKS; VOLUNTEER |
---|
18 | 20 | | MOBILE MEDICAL UNITS. (a) The division, in consultation with the |
---|
19 | 21 | | Department of State Health Services, shall increase awareness of |
---|
20 | 22 | | and encourage local government emergency response teams to utilize |
---|
21 | 23 | | services provided by local volunteer networks, including the |
---|
22 | 24 | | Medical Reserve Corps, that are available in the area to respond |
---|
23 | 25 | | during a disaster or emergency. |
---|
24 | 26 | | (b) The division shall develop a plan to create and manage |
---|
25 | 27 | | state-controlled volunteer mobile medical units in each public |
---|
26 | 28 | | health region to assist counties that lack access to a volunteer |
---|
27 | 29 | | network described by Subsection (a). |
---|
28 | | - | (c) The Department of State Health Services shall |
---|
29 | | - | collaborate with local medical organizations that represent |
---|
30 | | - | licensed physicians who practice in a county or public health |
---|
31 | | - | region to: |
---|
32 | | - | (1) ensure the physicians are informed about local |
---|
33 | | - | government emergency response teams and those teams are aware of |
---|
34 | | - | physician resources in the county or region, as applicable; |
---|
35 | | - | (2) compile and maintain a list of physicians in the |
---|
36 | | - | county or region and the contact information for the physicians; |
---|
37 | | - | (3) provide up-to-date information about resources |
---|
38 | | - | for physicians regarding disaster planning, including continuing |
---|
39 | | - | medical education; |
---|
40 | | - | (4) promote the Texas Disaster Volunteer Registry and |
---|
41 | | - | the Emergency System for Advance Registration of Volunteer Health |
---|
42 | | - | Professionals; |
---|
43 | | - | (5) consider incentives to assist with recruiting |
---|
44 | | - | physician volunteers; and |
---|
45 | | - | (6) encourage physicians and health professionals to |
---|
46 | | - | advocate for disaster planning measures in health care facilities. |
---|
47 | | - | SECTION 2. Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
48 | | - | adding Subchapter F-1 to read as follows: |
---|
49 | | - | SUBCHAPTER F-1. DISASTER ISSUES AFFECTING PERSONS WHO ARE ELDERLY |
---|
50 | | - | AND PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES |
---|
51 | | - | Sec. 418.131. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: |
---|
52 | | - | (1) "Disability" means, with respect to an individual, |
---|
53 | | - | a mental or physical impairment that substantially limits at least |
---|
54 | | - | one major life activity of that individual. |
---|
55 | | - | (2) "Task force" means the task force established |
---|
56 | | - | under Section 418.132. |
---|
57 | | - | Sec. 418.132. ESTABLISHMENT; PURPOSE. The task force on |
---|
58 | | - | disaster issues affecting persons who are elderly and persons with |
---|
59 | | - | disabilities is established to study methods to more effectively: |
---|
60 | | - | (1) assist persons who are elderly and persons with |
---|
61 | | - | disabilities during a disaster or emergency evacuation; and |
---|
62 | | - | (2) accommodate persons who are elderly and persons |
---|
63 | | - | with disabilities in emergency shelters. |
---|
64 | | - | Sec. 418.133. COMPOSITION. (a) The task force is composed |
---|
65 | | - | of 11 members appointed by the governor, including: |
---|
66 | | - | (1) three members who are first responders; |
---|
67 | | - | (2) one member who represents municipalities; |
---|
68 | | - | (3) one member who represents counties; and |
---|
69 | | - | (4) six members who represent persons with |
---|
70 | | - | disabilities. |
---|
71 | | - | (b) A majority of the members appointed to the task force |
---|
72 | | - | must be persons with disabilities or guardians of children with |
---|
73 | | - | disabilities. |
---|
74 | | - | (c) Members serve staggered six-year terms with the terms of |
---|
75 | | - | three or four members expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered |
---|
76 | | - | year. |
---|
77 | | - | (d) The governor shall designate one member of the task |
---|
78 | | - | force to serve as the presiding officer of the task force. The |
---|
79 | | - | presiding officer serves in that capacity at the pleasure of the |
---|
80 | | - | governor. |
---|
81 | | - | Sec. 418.134. TASK FORCE STUDY. (a) The task force shall |
---|
82 | | - | study methods to more effectively accommodate persons who are |
---|
83 | | - | elderly and persons with disabilities during a disaster or |
---|
84 | | - | emergency evacuation. The study must examine and make |
---|
85 | | - | recommendations on: |
---|
86 | | - | (1) the provision of informational materials to |
---|
87 | | - | persons who are elderly and persons with disabilities before a |
---|
88 | | - | disaster occurs on disaster or emergency evacuation; |
---|
89 | | - | (2) the accessibility of transportation and medical |
---|
90 | | - | supplies to persons who are elderly and persons with disabilities |
---|
91 | | - | during a disaster; |
---|
92 | | - | (3) different solutions for accommodating persons who |
---|
93 | | - | are elderly and persons with disabilities during a disaster or |
---|
94 | | - | emergency evacuation of a rural or urban area; |
---|
95 | | - | (4) the ability to effectively communicate with |
---|
96 | | - | persons who are elderly and persons with disabilities during a |
---|
97 | | - | disaster; and |
---|
98 | | - | (5) the availability of volunteers to assist persons |
---|
99 | | - | who are elderly and persons with disabilities during an emergency |
---|
100 | | - | evacuation. |
---|
101 | | - | (b) The task force shall develop and submit a written report |
---|
102 | | - | of the study and recommendations developed by the task force to the |
---|
103 | | - | governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of |
---|
104 | | - | representatives, and each member of the legislature not later than |
---|
105 | | - | December 1, 2020. |
---|
106 | | - | (c) This section expires June 1, 2021. |
---|
107 | | - | SECTION 3. The Texas Division of Emergency Management is |
---|
| 30 | + | SECTION 2. The Texas Division of Emergency Management is |
---|
114 | | - | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
115 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
116 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
117 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 982 passed the Senate on |
---|
118 | | - | April 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
119 | | - | May 24, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
120 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 25, 2019, House |
---|
121 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2019, Senate adopted |
---|
122 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
123 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
124 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
125 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
126 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 982 passed the House, with |
---|
127 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, |
---|
128 | | - | Nays 3, two present not voting; May 25, 2019, House granted |
---|
129 | | - | request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
130 | | - | May 26, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
131 | | - | following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
132 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
133 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
134 | | - | Approved: |
---|
135 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
136 | | - | Date |
---|
137 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
138 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 37 | + | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|