Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB982 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            S.B. No. 982


 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of disaster and emergency services,
 including health care services, to certain populations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 418.054 and 418.055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.054.  EMERGENCY PLAN FOR SPECIALTY CARE
 POPULATIONS. The division, in consultation with the Department of
 State Health Services and local governmental entities that have
 established emergency management plans, shall develop a plan to
 increase the capabilities of local emergency shelters in the
 provision of shelter and care for specialty care populations during
 a disaster.
 Sec. 418.055.  ACCESS TO LOCAL VOLUNTEER NETWORKS; VOLUNTEER
 MOBILE MEDICAL UNITS. (a)  The division, in consultation with the
 Department of State Health Services, shall increase awareness of
 and encourage local government emergency response teams to utilize
 services provided by local volunteer networks, including the
 Medical Reserve Corps, that are available in the area to respond
 during a disaster or emergency.
 (b)  The division shall develop a plan to create and manage
 state-controlled volunteer mobile medical units in each public
 health region to assist counties that lack access to a volunteer
 network described by Subsection (a).
 (c)  The Department of State Health Services shall
 collaborate with local medical organizations that represent
 licensed physicians who practice in a county or public health
 region to:
 (1)  ensure the physicians are informed about local
 government emergency response teams and those teams are aware of
 physician resources in the county or region, as applicable;
 (2)  compile and maintain a list of physicians in the
 county or region and the contact information for the physicians;
 (3)  provide up-to-date information about resources
 for physicians regarding disaster planning, including continuing
 medical education;
 (4)  promote the Texas Disaster Volunteer Registry and
 the Emergency System for Advance Registration of Volunteer Health
 Professionals;
 (5)  consider incentives to assist with recruiting
 physician volunteers; and
 (6)  encourage physicians and health professionals to
 advocate for disaster planning measures in health care facilities.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter F-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER F-1. DISASTER ISSUES AFFECTING PERSONS WHO ARE ELDERLY
 AND PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES
 Sec. 418.131.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Disability" means, with respect to an individual,
 a mental or physical impairment that substantially limits at least
 one major life activity of that individual.
 (2)  "Task force" means the task force established
 under Section 418.132.
 Sec. 418.132.  ESTABLISHMENT; PURPOSE. The task force on
 disaster issues affecting persons who are elderly and persons with
 disabilities is established to study methods to more effectively:
 (1)  assist persons who are elderly and persons with
 disabilities during a disaster or emergency evacuation; and
 (2)  accommodate persons who are elderly and persons
 with disabilities in emergency shelters.
 Sec. 418.133.  COMPOSITION. (a)  The task force is composed
 of 11 members appointed by the governor, including:
 (1)  three members who are first responders;
 (2)  one member who represents municipalities;
 (3)  one member who represents counties; and
 (4)  six members who represent persons with
 disabilities.
 (b)  A majority of the members appointed to the task force
 must be persons with disabilities or guardians of children with
 disabilities.
 (c)  Members serve staggered six-year terms with the terms of
 three or four members expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered
 year.
 (d)  The governor shall designate one member of the task
 force to serve as the presiding officer of the task force.  The
 presiding officer serves in that capacity at the pleasure of the
 governor.
 Sec. 418.134.  TASK FORCE STUDY. (a)  The task force shall
 study methods to more effectively accommodate persons who are
 elderly and persons with disabilities during a disaster or
 emergency evacuation. The study must examine and make
 recommendations on:
 (1)  the provision of informational materials to
 persons who are elderly and persons with disabilities before a
 disaster occurs on disaster or emergency evacuation;
 (2)  the accessibility of transportation and medical
 supplies to persons who are elderly and persons with disabilities
 during a disaster;
 (3)  different solutions for accommodating persons who
 are elderly and persons with disabilities during a disaster or
 emergency evacuation of a rural or urban area;
 (4)  the ability to effectively communicate with
 persons who are elderly and persons with disabilities during a
 disaster; and
 (5)  the availability of volunteers to assist persons
 who are elderly and persons with disabilities during an emergency
 evacuation.
 (b)  The task force shall develop and submit a written report
 of the study and recommendations developed by the task force to the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and each member of the legislature not later than
 December 1, 2020.
 (c)  This section expires June 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Division of Emergency Management is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the division may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 982 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 25, 2019, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2019, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 982 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 141,
 Nays 3, two present not voting; May 25, 2019, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 26, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor