House | 05/15/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |