Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB991 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2019

                    By: Menéndez, Lucio S.B. No. 991
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2019; March 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 11, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 4; April 11, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 991 By:  Alvarado


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the issuance of digital identification.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Department" and "driver's license" have the
 meanings assigned by Section 521.001, Transportation Code.
 (2)  "Digital identification" includes digital
 driver's licenses and digital personal identification
 certificates.
 SECTION 2.  STUDY AND REPORT. (a)  The department shall
 contract with a third party to conduct a study and create a report
 on the feasibility of issuing digital identification in this state.
 (b)  The study must:
 (1)  determine whether the department should establish
 a pilot program for the issuance of digital identification;
 (2)  determine whether a person may use digital
 identification in the same manner as a physical driver's license or
 personal identification certificate, including whether
 circumstances exist under which a person may not use digital
 identification;
 (3)  assess existing department infrastructure and
 identify changes required to issue digital identification in this
 state; and
 (4)  evaluate existing mobile applications that:
 (A)  are capable of displaying digital
 identification;
 (B)  include an authentication and verification
 process for a wireless communication device; and
 (C)  may be used in any location regardless of the
 location's level of wireless connectivity or cellular service.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the department shall
 submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, and members of the
 legislature the report created under Subsection (a) of this section
 that includes the findings of the study conducted under this
 section and any legislative recommendations based on the study.
 SECTION 3.  EXPIRATION DATE. This Act expires January 1,
 2023.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *