Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB999 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/21/2019

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 999
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2019; March 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 21, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 21, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a state plan for education on and treatment of
 Alzheimer's disease and related disorders.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 99 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 99.  STATE PLAN FOR ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND RELATED
 DISORDERS
 Sec. 99.001.  DEVELOPMENT AND IMPLEMENTATION OF STATE PLAN.
 (a)  The department, using existing resources and programs to the
 extent possible, shall develop and implement a state plan for
 education on and treatment of Alzheimer's disease and related
 disorders.
 (b)  The state plan must include best practices and
 strategies for:
 (1)  improving early detection of, reducing disease
 onset risks for, and improving treatment of Alzheimer's disease and
 related disorders for specific demographic groups;
 (2)  educating health care professionals, caregivers,
 and the public to increase awareness of Alzheimer's disease and
 related disorders;
 (3)  providing caregiver support;
 (4)  advancing basic science and applied research
 related to Alzheimer's disease and related disorders; and
 (5)  collecting and evaluating information on efforts
 to prevent and treat Alzheimer's disease and related disorders.
 Sec. 99.002.  COMMENTS FROM INTERESTED PARTIES.  (a)  In
 developing the state plan under Section 99.001, the department
 shall seek comments from interested parties, including:
 (1)  members of the public with, or who care for persons
 with, Alzheimer's disease or related disorders;
 (2)  each state agency that provides services to
 persons with Alzheimer's disease or related disorders;
 (3)  any advisory body that addresses issues related to
 Alzheimer's disease or related disorders;
 (4)  public advocates concerned with issues related to
 Alzheimer's disease or related disorders;
 (5)  health care providers who provide services to
 persons with Alzheimer's disease or related disorders; and
 (6)  researchers of issues affecting persons with
 Alzheimer's disease or related disorders.
 (b)  On request of the department, the commission shall
 provide information and comments related to services provided to
 persons with Alzheimer's disease or related disorders.
 (c)  The department shall meet with interested parties at
 least two times each year to:
 (1)  facilitate comments on and discuss the progress of
 developing and implementing the state plan developed under this
 chapter; and
 (2)  gather information for the report required under
 Section 99.004.
 Sec. 99.003.  REVIEW AND MODIFICATION OF STATE PLAN.  The
 department shall conduct a review and modify as necessary the state
 plan developed under this chapter at least once every five years.
 Sec. 99.004.  REPORT.  Not later than September 1 of each
 even-numbered year, the department shall submit to the legislature
 a report on the development and implementation or the review or
 modification of the state plan developed under this chapter.
 Sec. 99.005.  GIFTS AND GRANTS.  The department may accept
 gifts and grants from any source to fund the duties of the
 department under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *