Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB999 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 11, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019