Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019