Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/10/2019

                            S.C.R. No. 21


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, On June 11, 2015, the Department of Aging and
 Disability Services ("DADS"), a "covered entity" under Privacy,
 Security, and Breach Notification Rules ("HIPAA Rules"), filed a
 breach notification report with the United States Department of
 Health and Human Services, Office for Civil Rights ("OCR") stating
 that an impermissible disclosure of unsecured electronic protected
 health information (ePHI) in violation of HIPAA Rules had occurred
 when a DADS web application was accessible to unauthorized parties;
 and
 WHEREAS, On July 23, 2015, OCR notified DADS of its
 investigation of DADS compliance with the HIPAA Rules and
 determined that:
 a.  DADS failed to conduct an accurate and thorough
 assessment of the potential risks and vulnerabilities to the
 confidentiality, integrity, and availability of ePHI held by the
 covered entity.  (See 45 C.F.R. Section 164.308(a)(1)(ii)(A))
 b.  DADS failed to implement appropriate technical
 policies and procedures for electronic information systems that
 maintain electronic protected health information to allow access
 only to those persons or software programs that have been granted
 access rights as specified in 45 C.F.R. Section 164.308(a)(4).
 (See 45 C.F.R. Section 164.312(a)(1))
 c.  DADS failed to implement appropriate hardware,
 software, and/or procedural mechanisms that record and examine
 activity in information systems that contained or used ePHI.  (See
 45 C.F.R. Section 164.312(b))
 d.  As a result of its failure to appropriately
 safeguard the ePHI in a web-based application, DADS impermissibly
 disclosed the ePHI of up to 6,617 individuals.  (See 45
 C.F.R. Section 164.502(a)); and
 WHEREAS, OCR presented the State of Texas a Resolution
 Agreement with Corrective Action Plan (the "Settlement Agreement")
 in lieu of civil monetary penalties and to provide DADS an
 opportunity to correct DADS's failures to safeguard ePHI; and
 WHEREAS, The State of Texas has presented a counter-proposal
 to the Settlement Agreement to OCR that applies to those covered
 functions and information resources involved in the breach that
 were formerly operated by DADS but that have been transferred to the
 Health and Human Services Commission ("TX HHS"); and
 WHEREAS, The proposed Settlement Agreement comprises the
 following terms and conditions:
 Payment.  TX HHS agrees to pay the amount of
 $1,600,000.00.
 Corrective Action Plan.  TX HHS has entered into and
 agrees to comply with a Corrective Action Plan ("CAP").  If TX HHS
 breaches the CAP, and fails to cure the breach as set forth in the
 CAP, then TX HHS will be in breach of the Settlement Agreement and
 OCR will not be subject to the release set forth in the Settlement
 Agreement.  Compliance with the RA/CAP of the Settlement Agreement
 by TX HHS is conditioned upon TX HHS obtaining the approval of, and
 appropriation of funds needed to comply with, the RA/CAP by the
 Legislature of the State of Texas. (See Texas Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code Section 111.003(b)). The term of the Corrective
 Action Plan will be three (3) years from the effective date of the
 proposed agreement.
 Release by OCR.  In consideration of and conditioned
 upon performance by TX HHS of its obligations under the proposed
 Settlement Agreement, OCR releases TX HHS from any actions it may
 have against TX HHS under the HIPAA Rules arising out of or related
 to the conduct identified in paragraph 2 of this concurrent
 resolution.  OCR does not release TX HHS from, nor waive any rights,
 obligations, or causes of action other than those arising out of or
 related to said conduct and referred to in this paragraph.
 Agreement by Released Parties.  TX HHS shall not contest
 the validity of its obligation to pay, nor the amount of, the
 Resolution Amount or any other obligations agreed to under the
 proposed Settlement Agreement.  TX HHS waives all procedural rights
 granted under Section 1128A of the Social Security Act (42
 U.S.C. Section 1320a-7a); and 45 C.F.R. Part 160, Subpart E; and
 claims collection regulations at 45 C.F.R. Part 30, including, but
 not limited to, notice, hearing, and appeal with respect to the
 Resolution Amount; and
 WHEREAS, Section 111.003(a)(2), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, requires the legislature to approve a settlement of a claim or
 action against the state if the settlement commits the state to a
 course of action that in reasonable probability will entail a
 continuing increased expenditure of state funds over subsequent
 state fiscal biennia; and
 WHEREAS, The CAP of the proposed agreement commits the State
 of Texas to a course of action that in reasonable probability
 entails a continuing increased expenditure of state funds over
 subsequent state fiscal biennia; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 86th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby approve the proposed Settlement Agreement.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 21 was adopted by the Senate
 on April 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 21 was adopted by the House
 on May 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 2,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor