2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | BE IT RESOLVED by the 86th Legislature, That a joint |
---|
6 | 6 | | committee, composed of six members of the senate appointed by the |
---|
7 | 7 | | lieutenant governor and six members of the house of representatives |
---|
8 | 8 | | appointed by the speaker of the house, arrange for the canvass of |
---|
9 | 9 | | the votes cast for governor and lieutenant governor at the general |
---|
10 | 10 | | election held on November 6, 2018, and that a joint session of the |
---|
11 | 11 | | senate and house be held in the hall of the house of representatives |
---|
12 | 12 | | at 12 noon on Thursday, January 10, 2019, for the purpose of |
---|
13 | 13 | | counting the votes, receiving the report, and hearing the |
---|
14 | 14 | | declaration of the results of the canvass; and, be it further |
---|
15 | 15 | | RESOLVED, That the senate and house of representatives sit in |
---|
16 | 16 | | joint session at 11 a.m. on Tuesday, January 15, 2019, for the |
---|
17 | 17 | | inauguration of the governor-elect and lieutenant governor-elect |
---|
18 | 18 | | of Texas as determined by the canvass of the votes; and, be it |
---|
19 | 19 | | further |
---|
20 | 20 | | RESOLVED, That a joint committee, composed of five members of |
---|
21 | 21 | | the senate appointed by the lieutenant governor and five members of |
---|
22 | 22 | | the house of representatives appointed by the speaker of the house, |
---|
23 | 23 | | make arrangements for the joint session and oath-taking ceremony on |
---|
24 | 24 | | January 15, 2019; and, be it further |
---|
25 | 25 | | RESOLVED, That the Department of Public Safety of the State |
---|
26 | 26 | | of Texas is instructed to close all vehicle entrances to the Capitol |
---|
27 | 27 | | grounds beginning at 5 p.m. on Monday, January 14, 2019, and ending |
---|
28 | 28 | | at 11:59 p.m. on Tuesday, January 15, 2019, except for those |
---|
29 | 29 | | vehicles approved by the inaugural committee as necessary for use |
---|
30 | 30 | | in connection with the joint session and oath-taking ceremony and |
---|
31 | 31 | | the program following. |
---|
32 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
33 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
36 | | - | I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 3 was adopted by the Senate |
---|
37 | | - | on January 8, 2019, by a viva-voce vote. |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
40 | | - | I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 3 was adopted by the House |
---|
41 | | - | on January 9, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, |
---|
42 | | - | one present not voting. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
45 | | - | Approved: |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Date |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Governor |
---|